Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abell, Joseph D, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dustin Causey, against Kroger Texas L.P. D B A Kroger Store No. K034 East Houston, Reddy Ice, Llc, represented by Brock C. Akers, Lindsay G. Gorbach, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Vincenzo J. Santini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincenzo J. Santini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Joseph D. Abell against Kroger Texas L.P. d/b/a Kroger Store No. K034 East/Houston. Joseph Abell alleges that on October 6, 2022, he slipped and fell on a clear liquid on the floor of Kroger Store No. K034, sustaining serio...
Jury Trial
Date: May 06, 2024Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: September 01, 2023Subpoena
Date: August 16, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: August 10, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: August 11, 2023Signed Order
Date: August 10, 2023Notice
Date: August 09, 2023Designation
Date: August 07, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: August 07, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: July 31, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 28, 2023Notice
Date: July 20, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: July 24, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 14, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 07, 2023Designation
Date: July 07, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: July 05, 2023Amended Answer
Date: July 03, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 03, 2023Answer
Date: June 28, 2023Certificate
Date: June 21, 2023Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: June 08, 2023Original Answer
Date: June 02, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 31, 2023Notice
Date: May 30, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: May 22, 2023Request
Date: May 22, 2023Amended Answer
Date: May 22, 2023Certificate
Date: May 08, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 03, 2023Amended Petition
Date: May 03, 2023Notice
Date: May 02, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: April 27, 2023Jury Trial Requested
Date: April 21, 2023Original Answer
Date: April 21, 2023Return of Service
Date: April 21, 2023Letters
Date: April 12, 2023Request For Service
Date: April 11, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: April 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) 12/04/2023Reset by Court to 05/06/2024 Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed-Subpoena Duces Tecum- HCA Houston Healthcare Conroe f/k/a Conroe Regional Medical Center Subpoena |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (5/6/24) Docket Control Order |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery- Memorial Hermann The Woodlands Hospital (Billing) Certificate of Deposition |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Joint Motion for Continuance Signed Order |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions Notice |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Reddy Ice LLC's Designation of Expert Witnesses Designation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.