Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Serrano, Leopoldo, Steven Sexton A N F Of G.S., A Minor, D.S., A Minor, M.S., A Minor, And V.S., A Minor, Torres, Alfonsa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patrick Scott, against Hartwell, Michael, represented by Nicholas J Lanza, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts 284th Judicial District Court with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House284th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Notice of Nonsuit
Date: March 15, 2024Jury Trial
Date: December 04, 2023Order to Appoint
Date: September 13, 2023Entry
Date: December 22, 2023Original Answer
Date: March 30, 2023Partial Judgment
Date: December 22, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 28, 2023Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: March 18, 2024Jury Trial Requested
Date: March 30, 2023Notice
Date: November 20, 2023Notice
Date: November 22, 2023Request for Service
Date: March 20, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: March 31, 2023Signed Order
Date: December 22, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 12, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: March 20, 2023Return of Service
Date: March 24, 2023Notice
Date: November 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 12, 2023Agreed Judgment
Date: December 22, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 15, 2024Jury Trial
Date: December 04, 2023Request For Service
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting All Remaining Plaintiffs' Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice as to Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting All Remaining Plaintiffs' Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice as to Proposed Order |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Monetary Judgment - Patrick Scott Partial Judgment |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Appointment Fees Signed Order |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.