Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Valley Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kashun Winnie Cheung, against Murray, Tianna L., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Abstract of Judgment
Date: May 11, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 10, 2023Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: April 14, 2023Default Judgment
Date: April 06, 2023Motion for Default Judgment
Date: April 05, 2023Signed Order
Date: March 24, 2023Signed Order
Date: February 24, 2023Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: February 24, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 23, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 23, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: January 19, 2023Signed Order
Date: January 19, 2023Return of Service
Date: December 13, 2022Signed Order
Date: November 29, 2022Proposed Order
Date: November 28, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 15, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 28, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 28, 2022Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: September 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Abstract Abstract of Judgment |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request For Service |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket (reset 4.14.23) Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Foreclosure not Requested) Motion for Default Judgment |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket (reset 4.14.23) Signed Order |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.