Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ctl Propco I Lp, Jc Penney Corporation, Inc., As Lessee, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Andrew B. Albright, Gregory M Hart, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Bench Trial
Date: August 21, 2023Entry
Date: September 22, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 08, 2023Notice
Date: August 10, 2023Signed Order
Date: August 09, 2023Agreed Judgment
Date: September 11, 2023Notice
Date: June 02, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: March 01, 2023Designation
Date: May 23, 2023Rule 11
Date: May 04, 2023Entry
Date: March 24, 2023Certificate
Date: April 24, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 24, 2023Original Answer
Date: October 11, 2022Signed Order
Date: March 01, 2023Designation
Date: October 17, 2022Notice
Date: January 20, 2023Letters
Date: January 13, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 28, 2023Certificate
Date: December 06, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 16, 2022Return of Service
Date: September 21, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed08/11/2023Reset by Court to 09/22/2023 |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Other |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Retain on the Civil Docket Signed Order |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Retain on the Civil Docket Motion (No Fee) |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreements |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.