Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Klages, Frederick P, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kenneth R. Cole, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Bench Trial
Date: May 22, 2023Agreed Judgment
Date: April 12, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: December 27, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 31, 2022Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: April 28, 2023Settlement Agreements
Date: April 03, 2023Certificate
Date: December 27, 2022Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: April 03, 2023Original Answer
Date: October 04, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 15, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Other |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement Settlement Agreements |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th Show Cause Order Injunction or Show Cause (OCA) |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Certificate of Completion of Court Ordered Discovery Certificate |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Docket Control Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.