Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jared B. Hall, against Jefferson, Eugene Chance, Jefferson, Keanna De Keshia, represented by John M Causey, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer/Commerical Debt - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Entry
Date: January 06, 2023Return of Service
Date: November 07, 2022Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Nonsuit
Date: November 14, 2022Notice
Date: November 03, 2022Original Answer
Date: November 04, 2022Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 03, 2022Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: October 21, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 01, 2022Signed Order
Date: October 24, 2022Letters
Date: November 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: November 01, 2022Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Partial Judgment
Date: October 11, 2022Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 03, 2022Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: September 13, 2022Return of Service
Date: September 01, 2022Request For Service
Date: June 29, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation - Eugene Chance Jefferson Return of Service |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Original Answer Original Answer |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution09/30/2022Reset by Court to 10/21/202210/21/2022Reset by Court to 11/04/2022 |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.