Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jesus G Davila, against Buchanan, Paul, Buchanan, Teri, represented by Ted E Dravis, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Entry
Date: April 01, 2022Jury Trial
Date: August 15, 2022Order of Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 31, 2022Notice
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate
Date: February 16, 2022Rule 11
Date: March 11, 2022Rule 11
Date: February 18, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: January 18, 2022Response
Date: January 18, 2022Answer
Date: January 18, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: January 18, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: December 16, 2021Answer
Date: November 18, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: November 19, 2021Return of Service
Date: October 18, 2021Return of Service
Date: October 13, 2021Request For Service
Date: October 05, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: October 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Other Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Order of Dismissal Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Settlement Rule 11 Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Regarding Affidavit Deadline Rule 11 Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery and Plaintiff's First Amended Rule 194 Initial Disclosure Certificate Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.