Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Magnolia Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Leslie M Schkade, against Beers, Sara, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Release of Judgment
Date: May 08, 2023Certificate
Date: April 25, 2022Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: April 29, 2022Bench Trial
Date: April 28, 2022Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: January 10, 2023Affidavit
Date: April 25, 2022Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Notice
Date: February 04, 2022Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: September 16, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Final Order After Non-Jury Trial |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Notification Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address Certificate |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Status Affidavit |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Notice |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Notification Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.