Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoffman, Brianna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Cordell, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Tracy A. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy A. Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Answer
Date: September 16, 2021Signed Order
Date: September 16, 2021Signed Order
Date: September 03, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 01, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cordell Ward's Answer Answer |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order, Order for Mediation and Order Setting Hearing Signed Order |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationWard, CordellServed09/11/2021Returned09/13/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining OrderWard, CordellServed09/11/2021Returned09/13/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders Signed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.