Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Machinsky, Dwayne Paul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Machinsky, Ashley Elizabeth Beard, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Tracy A. Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Letters
Date: September 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2021Letters
Date: July 08, 2021Order for Transfer of Out of County Case to Montgomery Co.
Date: June 23, 2021Answer
Date: May 13, 2021Letters
Date: April 23, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DCO ATY Letters |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order of Referral to Mediation Proposed Order |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross Action/Counterpetition | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transfer Letter With Index Letters |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Transfer (County Use Only)(OCA) | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Transfer Jurisdiction Order for Transfer of Out of County Case to Montgomery Co. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.