Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Builders & Contractors Supply Company, Inc., Dba Abc Supply Co., Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lawrence J. Falli, against William Perry Bruce Dba Pro Tech Roofing, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Case <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: June 02, 2021Notice
Date: May 28, 2021Request For Service
Date: May 07, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice Notice Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment - First National Bank Texas Request For Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of GarnishmentFirst National Bank Texas d/b/a First Convenience Bank Unserved
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.