Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Emergency Services District # 07, Montgomery County Hospital District, Splendora Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alan B Bush, against Orvin Apgar Aka Orvin Wayne Apgar Jr., Tracy Apgar Aka Tracy Godejohn Apgar, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: January 12, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationOrvin Apgar AKA Orvin Wayne Apgar Jr.Served09/10/2020Returned09/18/2020
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationTracy Apgar AKA Tracy Godejohn ApgarServed09/14/2020Returned09/17/2020
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationTracy Apgar AKA Tracy Godejohn Apgar Unserved | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationOrvin Apgar AKA Orvin Wayne Apgar Jr. Unserved | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request For Service | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.