Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Conroe Independent School District, Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Emergency Services District # 07, Montgomery County Hospital District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alan B Bush, against Bevil, Harold H., Chapman, Robin G., Ganchan, Richard P., Giffon, Robert J., Goff, Robert, (total of 12) See All represented by Joshua Jay Benn, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Signed Order
Date: September 23, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 01, 2022Signed Order
Date: January 27, 2022Notice
Date: September 01, 2022Finance - Excess Proceeds Notice
Date: July 08, 2022Writ - Order of Sale
Date: April 21, 2022Letters
Date: April 06, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: April 06, 2022Bench Trial
Date: January 27, 2022Proposed Order
Date: January 24, 2022Affidavit
Date: January 24, 2022Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: January 27, 2022Notice
Date: November 18, 2021Amended Petition
Date: November 03, 2021Certificate
Date: January 24, 2022Amended Petition
Date: August 02, 2021Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: November 18, 2021Signed Order
Date: July 30, 2021Affidavit
Date: July 21, 2021Signed Order
Date: July 22, 2021Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: July 22, 2021Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: June 15, 2021Answer
Date: April 09, 2021Amended Petition
Date: April 08, 2021No Fee Documents
Date: April 08, 2021Signed Order
Date: March 25, 2021Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: March 25, 2021Order to Appoint
Date: March 24, 2021Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: February 04, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: March 24, 2021Request For Service
Date: September 02, 2020Request For Service
Date: December 01, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Excess Proceeds from the Court's Registry Signed Order |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Excess Proceeds (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Petition to Withdraw Excess Proceeds from the Court's Registry Motion (No Fee) |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission Notice |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tax - Tax Atty Notice of Excess Proceeds - Alan Bush Finance - Excess Proceeds Notice |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding Order of Sale in Tax Suit Writ - Order of Sale |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ServiceRayburn Development CompanyServed06/01/2022Returned06/28/2022 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding Order of Sale in Tax Suit Letters |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.