Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Butler, Johnny, Jr., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Darlene Payne Smith, against Johnny Butler, Sr., Individually And As Independent Executor For The Estate Of Ruby Butler Butler, Johnny, Sr., Johnny Butler, Sr., Individually And As Independent Executor For The Estate Of Ruby Butler  Butler, Johnny, Sr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Letters
Date: April 19, 2021Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: March 30, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: April 06, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 30, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th Show Cause Order Show Cause Hearing (OCA) CANCELED Show Cause Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return to Sender / No Such Number Letters Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice Order of Dismissal Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th Show Cause Order Order to Appear and Show Cause Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service- Johnny Butler Sr. Return of Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationJohnny Butler, Sr., Individually and as Independent Executor for the Estate of Ruby ButlerServed11/11/2020Returned11/12/2020
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Service Request For Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.