Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cates, David A., filed a(n) Other Civil Case >$200,000 case represented by Kenna M. Seiler, against Barrett, Emily Temporary Administrator Of The Estate Of Shirley Sue Cates, Edward Jones Trust Company, represented by Donald Littlefield, Jeffrey W Steidley, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Case >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: January 30, 2021Notice of Nonsuit
Date: January 27, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 27, 2021Rule 11
Date: October 15, 2020Response
Date: September 25, 2020Response
Date: September 14, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 14, 2020Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 14, 2020Objection
Date: September 11, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2020Response
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Submission
Date: September 08, 2020Certificate
Date: September 04, 2020Order of Abatement/Stay/Arbitration (OCA)
Date: September 08, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 04, 2020Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Submission
Date: September 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 26, 2020Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 26, 2020Response
Date: August 26, 2020Amended Answer
Date: August 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 07, 2020Response
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Submission
Date: August 12, 2020Answer
Date: August 07, 2020Response
Date: August 05, 2020Intra-County Court Transfer Order
Date: August 04, 2020Answer
Date: August 05, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 30, 2020Answer
Date: July 27, 2020Return of Service
Date: July 07, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: July 01, 2020Request For Service
Date: July 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
January 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Non-Suit With Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit With Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order of Dismissal Proposed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Reply Regarding Motion for Protection Response Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J)
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J)
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Response to Motion for Protection Response Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Protection Proposed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.