Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Innovative Cooling & Energy Solutions, Inc. A K A Innovative Solutions & Energy Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by William T Fowler, against Hall, Patricia Denise, Katlin Hall Aka Katlin D. Hall, Katlin Hall Aka Katlin D. Hall Patricia Denise Hall A K A Patricia Hall A K A Patricia Scroggins A K A Patricia Denise Scroggins, Patricia Denise Hall A K A Katlin D. Hall A K A Patricia Hall A K A Patricia Scroggins A K A Patricia Denise Scroggins, represented by Eric Yollick, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypePartial Dismissal |
Designation
Date: April 21, 2023Certificate
Date: July 19, 2023Amended Filing
Date: July 19, 2023Amended Answer
Date: April 12, 2023Certificate
Date: June 16, 2023Notice
Date: June 13, 2023Notice
Date: April 24, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: February 10, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: January 30, 2023Order of Consolidation
Date: February 08, 2023Answer
Date: December 15, 2022Certificate
Date: April 12, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: September 22, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: September 22, 2022Signed Order
Date: September 27, 2022Certificate
Date: January 30, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 22, 2022Request
Date: September 22, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: September 28, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 07, 2022Response
Date: September 21, 2022Notice
Date: August 23, 2022Proposed Order
Date: September 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: September 21, 2022Notice
Date: September 07, 2022Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: August 23, 2022Proposed Order
Date: June 08, 2022Response
Date: June 08, 2022Affidavit
Date: August 23, 2022Signed Order
Date: June 20, 2022Notice
Date: June 22, 2022Submission
Date: June 10, 2022Correspondence
Date: May 23, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: May 17, 2022Notice
Date: May 11, 2022Amended Petition
Date: May 05, 2022Entry
Date: May 20, 2022Signed Order
Date: April 26, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: April 20, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: March 31, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: March 28, 2022Signed Order
Date: February 17, 2022Notice
Date: December 20, 2021Notice
Date: March 31, 2022Signed Order
Date: March 30, 2022Rule 11
Date: December 17, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 15, 2022Notice
Date: February 22, 2022Motion for Nonsuit
Date: December 17, 2021Notice
Date: December 15, 2021Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: December 22, 2021Answer
Date: November 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2021Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: December 17, 2021Notice
Date: December 14, 2021No Fee Documents
Date: December 15, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 14, 2021Notice
Date: August 11, 2020Intra-County Court Transfer Order
Date: August 04, 2020Answer
Date: April 13, 2020Return of Service
Date: March 02, 2020Signed Order
Date: February 18, 2020Notice
Date: February 28, 2020Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: November 26, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 03, 2020Request For Service
Date: December 04, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: November 26, 2019Answer
Date: September 16, 2021Intervention/Interpleader
Date: September 10, 2021Signed Order
Date: August 19, 2021Hearing
Date: August 27, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: August 20, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 17, 2021No Fee Documents
Date: August 10, 2021Notice
Date: August 11, 2021Partial Summary Judgment
Date: August 12, 2021Response
Date: August 05, 2021Response
Date: August 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 30, 2021Response
Date: July 30, 2021Amended Petition
Date: October 13, 2020Answer
Date: October 05, 2020Request For Service
Date: October 13, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: September 14, 2020Amended Petition
Date: September 08, 2020Certificate
Date: June 20, 2023Notice
Date: July 14, 2021Amended Filing
Date: July 14, 2021Letters
Date: May 14, 2021Letters
Date: February 24, 2021Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: April 07, 2021Answer
Date: February 09, 2021Order for Continuance
Date: February 05, 2021No Fee Documents
Date: February 05, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: February 05, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: February 04, 2021Original Answer
Date: January 19, 2021Intervention/Interpleader
Date: February 03, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 19, 2021Rule 11
Date: February 03, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 12, 2020Notice
Date: January 15, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 15, 2021Affidavit
Date: December 10, 2020Signed Order
Date: November 16, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2020No Fee Documents
Date: November 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Certificate |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions Amended Filing |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Certificate |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Certificate |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Intention To Take Deposition by Written Question- Equine Partners Veterinary Servi Notice |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention To Take Deposition by Written Question Notice |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Patricia Halls, Katlin Halls, and Margie Scroggins Expert Designation Designation |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Innovative Cooling & Energy Solutions, Inc.'s First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Answer |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Certificate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.