Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The King Morocco (Formerly) Myron Gerard Simms Jr. filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
CategoryJudicial Review - Fraudulent Documents |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Order of Dismissal
Date: December 10, 2019Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: May 22, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: November 22, 2019Original Answer
Date: November 12, 2019Original Answer
Date: November 27, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Failure to File Joint Notice Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Order of Dismissal Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin)
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.