Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hammond, Randall, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hammond, Jolyn, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Scheduling Order
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Call CANCELED Docket Call (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Robin, Jennifer J. )
Judge: : Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket Order to Reinstate (OCA) Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Resinstate Case on Docket Motion (No Fee) Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.