Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by John Kettler, against Sweetland, Randolph, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Proposed Order
Date: September 06, 2019Motion to Reinstate
Date: September 06, 2019Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 21, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 21, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 31, 2018Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: March 28, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Default Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Motion to Reinstate Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Injunction or Show Cause (OCA) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition & First Discovery Requests E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationSweetland, RandolphServed01/31/2019Returned02/04/2019
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.