Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jessica Olsen-Zhang, against Butcher, Lorrie, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: May 11, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: May 10, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 28, 2018Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: March 29, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Injunction or Show Cause (OCA) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationButcher, LorrieServed01/14/2019Returned01/14/2019
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition & First Discovery Requests E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.