Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shoemaker, Phillip Eugene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shoemaker, Kathy Sue, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Scharlene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Scharlene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Proposed Order
Date: September 13, 2019Signed Order
Date: July 19, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 19, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 14, 2019Signed Order
Date: April 15, 2019Letters
Date: February 27, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 15, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: February 04, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 28, 2018No Fee Documents
Date: September 16, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: July 19, 2019Correspondence
Date: July 12, 2019Amended Filing
Date: May 14, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: April 17, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: April 15, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 28, 2018Proposed Order
Date: April 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Brief in Support of Exercise of Partial Jurisdiction No Fee Documents Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Scharlene )
Judge: : Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement of Evidence Proposed Order Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.