Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lovin, Douglas Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lovin, Lea-Ann Pabunan, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Scheduling Order
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED Pro Se Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Bench Trial CANCELED Pro Se Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Pre-Trial CANCELED Pro Se Pre-Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) ()
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Notice Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Family-Non-Jury Scheduling Order Scheduling Order Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.