Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Walnut Cove Property Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Christopher J. Archambault, against Harper, David L, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Abstract of Judgement
Date: March 09, 2020Abstract of Judgement
Date: June 08, 2020Request For Service
Date: June 03, 2020Request
Date: March 05, 2020Request
Date: February 21, 2020Abstract of Judgement
Date: February 25, 2020Default Judgment
Date: October 29, 2019Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 09, 2019Bench Trial
Date: October 28, 2019Notice
Date: October 14, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 27, 2018Partial Nonsuit
Date: September 20, 2019Notice
Date: October 10, 2019Scheduling Order
Date: March 06, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 20, 2019Return of Service
Date: May 31, 2019Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: December 27, 2018E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Abstract of Judgement Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceHarper, David L Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request For Service Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgement- Issued Abstract of Judgement Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceHarper, David L Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Abstract Abstract of Judgement Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceHarper, David L Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.