Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stephanie Devillier, Individually And As Representative Of The Estate Of Kyle Hilton Devillier, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John S Morgan, against Unum Insurance Company, represented by Bill Ervin Davidoff, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryContract-Other >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Venue Transfer |
Request For Service
Date: December 31, 2018Change of Venue Transfer Out of County
Date: February 26, 2019Return of Service
Date: February 26, 2019Request For Service
Date: January 23, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Removal Change of Venue Transfer Out of County Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Executed citation to Unum Insurance Company Return of Service Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationUnum Insurance CompanyServed02/07/2019Returned02/26/2019
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Service Request For Service Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
F/C Citation-Standard-Unum Insurance Company Request For Service Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationUnum Insurance Company Returned Unserved 04/22/2019Returned04/22/2019
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.