Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sunrise Ranch Property Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edward, against Horn, Larry, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Letters
Date: November 14, 2019Abstract of Judgement
Date: November 25, 2019Request
Date: November 12, 2019Bench Trial
Date: October 28, 2019Summary Judgment
Date: October 08, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 27, 2019Notice
Date: August 28, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 16, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: July 16, 2019Designation
Date: March 05, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: March 04, 2019Return of Service
Date: January 14, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 26, 2018E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Abstract of Judgement Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ServiceHorn, Larry, Jr. Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Letter to Larry Horn, Jr. Letters Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil-Non-Jury Scheduling Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Call CANCELED Docket Call (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Summary Judgment Summary Judgment Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission Notice Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.