Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sunrise Ranch Property Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Eric B Tonsul, against Albritton, Robert Shane, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Request For Service
Date: January 10, 2020Abstract of Judgement
Date: January 15, 2020Summary Judgment
Date: December 07, 2019Summary Judgment
Date: December 06, 2019Notice
Date: November 06, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 06, 2019Designation
Date: August 19, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: March 29, 2019Original Answer
Date: January 28, 2019Return of Service
Date: January 10, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 26, 2018E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Post Judgment - Abstract Abstract of Judgement Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceAlbritton, Robert Shane Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for abstract of judgment Request For Service Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Summary Judgment Summary Judgment Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Motion (No Fee) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witness Designation Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.