Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Simmons Individually And As Nest Friend Of Kayla Simmons And Alisha Simmons, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by M. Paul Skrabanek, against Magnolia Independent School District, represented by Kent M Adams, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Motor Vehicle >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Signed Order
Date: December 28, 2020Answer
Date: May 31, 2019Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: May 11, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 21, 2018Injunction or Show Cause (OCA)
Date: March 29, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Signed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.