Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Volz, Luke, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patrick Scott, against Consumers County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Troy A Williams, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Motor Vehicle <$100,000 & Non-Monetary Relief |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: October 24, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Other Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry CANCELED Entry (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Passed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit with Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel CANCELED Motion to Compel (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Other Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Notification Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court -Case Settled No Fee Documents Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.