Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Security Credit Services, Llc Assignee Of Credit Shop Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kelly Macdevitt, against Stella, Leo, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Signed Order
Date: June 21, 2019Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: July 26, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 21, 2019Signed Order
Date: March 06, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 21, 2018Letters
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket (reset 8/2/19) Signed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order at Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Docket (reset 8/2/19) Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Retain Proposed Order Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Motion (No Fee) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.