Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Jeremy S. Dishongh Ii Dba Affordable Bail Bonds, Robertson, Kenosha, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Damico, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamico, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2018 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Judgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Notice
Date: March 11, 2019Signed Order
Date: September 11, 2018Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: May 03, 2019Judgment Nisi
Date: May 01, 2019Original Answer
Date: October 31, 2018Request For Service
Date: September 07, 2018Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: September 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Nisi - Final Judgment of Forfeiture Judgment Nisi Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Michalk, Lisa)
Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting Notice Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Answer of Defendant-Surety Original Answer Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail CitationJeremy S. Dishongh II dba Affordable Bail BondsServed09/22/2018Returned09/26/2018
Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Regular Mail CitationRobertson, Kenosha Unserved
Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI on Forfeiture of Bond Signed Order Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form Request For Service Judge: Damico, Paul |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet (OCA)/Case Information Filing Sheet Civil Case Information Sheet Judge: Damico, Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.