Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilken, Tracy Lynn, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Remessa Pineta Llc, Richard W Wilken Grantor Of The Richardw Wilken 2008 Gst Trust, Richard W Wilken Income Beneficiary Of The Richard W Wilken 2008 Gst Trust, Richard W Wilken Income Beneficiary Of The Richard W Wilken Revocable Trust, Richared W Wilken Trustee Of The Richard W Wilken Revocable Trust, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2018 |
CategoryPost Judgment Action Modification Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: August 20, 2020Signed Order
Date: August 14, 2020Answer
Date: August 15, 2019Post Judgment - Modification - Other (OCA)
Date: August 14, 2019Settlement Agreements
Date: June 20, 2019Signed Order
Date: June 07, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 27, 2019Signed Order
Date: December 05, 2018Signed Order
Date: November 26, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: October 12, 2018Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: September 11, 2018Original Answer
Date: September 11, 2018Signed Order
Date: August 15, 2018E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 14, 2018No Fee Documents
Date: June 13, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 27, 2019Rule 11
Date: February 20, 2019Rule 11
Date: February 04, 2019Designation
Date: January 08, 2019Rule 11
Date: January 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Case Disposed Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Nonsuit of Motion to Modify, Correct or Reform Final Decree of Divorce Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Signed: Notice of Intent to Dismiss with Confirmations Signed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Richard Wayne Wilken Response to Motion to Modify Correct of Reform Final Decree of Divorce Answer Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify, Correct or Reform Final Decree of Divorce Post Judgment - Modification - Other (OCA) Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.