Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Fleeks, Darrell Dewayne, John D. Lagway Dba Lagway'S Bail Bonds By Derek, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Maginnis, Patty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Judgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Original Answer
Date: January 02, 2020Notice
Date: November 21, 2019Notice
Date: February 21, 2019Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: August 09, 2018Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: July 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Nisi-Final Judgment Nisi Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Maginnis, Patty)
Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting Notice Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Judgment of Forfeiture Proposed Order Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Maginnis, Patty)
Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting Notice Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationFleeks, Darrell Dewayne Unserved
Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.