Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cumberland Crossing Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Trisha Taylor Farine, against Barron, Angel Abraham, Barron, Victoria De Los Angeles, represented by Travis Owens, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Notice
Date: November 18, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: November 07, 2019Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: September 30, 2019General Correspondence
Date: September 23, 2019Order for Continuance
Date: September 16, 2019Bench Trial
Date: September 16, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 13, 2019Response
Date: September 13, 2019Amended Filing
Date: September 12, 2019Notice
Date: September 03, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 03, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 03, 2019Return of Service
Date: July 02, 2019Request For Service
Date: June 19, 2019Amended Petition
Date: June 19, 2019Signed Order
Date: June 07, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: June 06, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: June 06, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 20, 2019Response
Date: February 19, 2019Notice
Date: January 29, 2019Signed Order
Date: January 25, 2019Order of Abatement/Stay/Arbitration (OCA)
Date: January 25, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 25, 2019Answer
Date: January 22, 2019Notice
Date: January 09, 2019Designation
Date: January 09, 2019Amended Filing
Date: January 07, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 04, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 04, 2019Notice
Date: January 04, 2019Scheduling Order
Date: July 18, 2018Proposed Order
Date: May 29, 2018Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: June 12, 2018Notice
Date: May 29, 2018Motion (No Fee)
Date: May 17, 2018Original Answer
Date: May 15, 2018Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: April 27, 2018Request For Service
Date: April 27, 2018E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: April 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Satisfaction and Release of Judgment Notice Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Certified Copy of Judgment No Fee Documents Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Final Order After Non-Jury Trial Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Lift Abatement/Stay/Arbitration (OCA)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's E-mail to Attorneys Regarding Bench Trial General Correspondence Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Robin, Jennifer J. )
Judge: : Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance Order for Continuance Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.