Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delagarza, Hector, Delagarza, Hector Jaime, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Justin A Rasch, against Delagarza, Lisbett K, Mota, Lisbett Kimara, represented by Amy R Harris, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Moreland, Charles T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Agreed Judgment
Date: February 09, 2021(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Enforcement
Date: February 05, 2021Answer
Date: February 05, 2021Notice
Date: June 21, 2019Notice Issued to Employer (Wage Withholding or Termination)
Date: May 15, 2019Return of Service
Date: May 24, 2019Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Date: May 09, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 08, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: April 22, 2019Waiver of Appeal
Date: April 12, 2019Notice
Date: April 11, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: March 27, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: April 09, 2019Rule 11
Date: March 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: March 21, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: March 19, 2019Bench Trial
Date: February 25, 2019Signed Order
Date: February 15, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 15, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 05, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: February 13, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 05, 2019Signed Order
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 15, 2018Amended Petition
Date: November 09, 2018Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 09, 2018Signed Order
Date: October 19, 2018Amended Filing
Date: September 20, 2018Request
Date: September 19, 2018Signed Order
Date: September 18, 2018Designation
Date: September 07, 2018Notice
Date: September 17, 2018Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: August 28, 2018Original Answer
Date: August 28, 2018Signed Order
Date: August 09, 2018Request For Service
Date: June 22, 2018Parenting Certificate
Date: July 26, 2018Return of Service
Date: July 02, 2018Amended Petition
Date: June 22, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: April 12, 2018Request For Service
Date: March 26, 2018(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Intervention
Date: March 26, 2018Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: March 26, 2018Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: February 20, 2018Request For Service
Date: February 20, 2018Indigency Oath Filed
Date: February 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed (RPMM) Agreed Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) Agreed Judgment Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed (RPMM) Agreed Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) (Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Enforcement Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Custodial and Noncustodial Parent Child Support Review Process Statement of Rights Answer Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee Notice Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned CMRRR Green Card to ExpressJet Airlines Return of Service Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding Issued to ExpressJet Airlines Notice Issued to Employer (Wage Withholding or Termination) Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.