Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Geesey, Pamela Dolores, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Geesey, Samuel May, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Stewart, Keith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Letters
Date: May 14, 2018Minute of the Court
Date: April 25, 2018Notice
Date: January 29, 2018Letters
Date: November 07, 2017Notice
Date: October 24, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 21, 2017Indigency Oath Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Letter to Pamela Dolores Geesey Letters Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Letter-Atty/Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Minute of the Court Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) 01/17/2018Reset by Court to 04/25/2018
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Notice Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Letter to Pamela Geesey Letters Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Notice Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs or an Appeal Bond Indigency Oath Filed Judge: Stewart, Keith |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.