Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Emergency Services District # 12, Montgomery County Hospital District, Splendora Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by James Guest, against H D Ramey, Deceased, All Known And Unknown Heirs, All Known And Unknown Owners, Any And All Other Persons Including Adverse Claimants, represented by Brian R. Cain, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2017 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Notice
Date: September 25, 2018Letters
Date: September 20, 2018Letters
Date: June 14, 2018Letters
Date: September 06, 2018Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: June 01, 2018Writ - Order of Sale
Date: June 04, 2018Letters
Date: May 29, 2018Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: March 08, 2018Order for Appointment Fees
Date: February 27, 2018Non-Jury
Date: February 22, 2018Proposed Order
Date: February 15, 2018No Fee Documents
Date: February 15, 2018Ad Litem Report
Date: February 15, 2018Affidavit
Date: February 15, 2018Certificate
Date: February 15, 2018Designation
Date: January 19, 2018Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: February 14, 2018Original Answer
Date: December 27, 2017Notice
Date: December 21, 2017Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 15, 2017Notice
Date: December 19, 2017Order to Appoint
Date: December 19, 2017Designation
Date: December 15, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: March 21, 2017E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: March 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
James Guest CMRR 6202 42 Notice Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CORRECTED COPY - LGB Payment Tansmittal Sheet for Payment of Excess Proceeds Letters Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Attorney Payment Transmittal Sheet with Payment for Court Cost Letters Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters Ret'd Copy of Letter for Receipt of Order of Sale from Constable Pct 4 Letters Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters Cover Letter for Tax Order of Sales (10) filed by LGB Writ - Order of Sale Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
ServiceH D Ramey, Deceased, All Known and Unknown Heirs, All Known and Unknown Owners, Any and All Other Persons Including Adverse ClaimantsServed07/25/2018Returned09/13/2018
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ - Order of Sale
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letters Cover Letter for Tax Order of Sales (10) filed by LGB Letters Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.