Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Willis Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Otilia Gonzales, against Koroleski, John, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Original Answer
Date: December 14, 2017Affidavit
Date: December 07, 2017Affidavit
Date: October 12, 2017Minute of the Court
Date: December 14, 2017Non-Jury
Date: December 14, 2017Proposed Order
Date: October 12, 2017Certificate
Date: December 07, 2017Proposed Order
Date: December 07, 2017Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: December 01, 2017Notice
Date: November 02, 2017E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 30, 2016Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: October 13, 2017Certificate
Date: October 12, 2017Designation
Date: October 02, 2017Notice
Date: September 08, 2017Intervention/Interpleader
Date: January 19, 2017Request For Service
Date: January 05, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer Original Answer Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court-Judgment Minute of the Court Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Non-Jury (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) 10/19/2017Reset by Court to 12/14/201712/14/2017Reset by Court to 10/19/2017 Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Status Affidavit Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address Certificate Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Notice Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.