Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Shenandoah, Conroe Independent School District, Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Hospital District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by James Guest, against Hae Chung-Garcia, D.D.S Ltd., Llp, Individually And Dba Advanced Center For Cosmetic Dentistry, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Minute of the Court
Date: September 24, 2018Letters
Date: December 27, 2017Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: December 27, 2017Certificate
Date: December 18, 2017Non-Jury
Date: December 14, 2017Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: December 01, 2017Certificate
Date: November 30, 2017Proposed Order
Date: November 30, 2017Designation
Date: October 26, 2017Request for Trial Setting
Date: September 06, 2017Letters
Date: September 06, 2017Answer
Date: February 14, 2017Request For Service
Date: January 04, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court Release of Judgment Minute of the Court Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding Payment for Court Costs Letters Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
284th Bailiff Certificate - Civil Certificate Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Judgment Non-Jury (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bill of cost -2 Finance - Bill of Cost Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Address Certificate Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Designation of Lead Counsel Designation Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Setting - Tax Docket Request for Trial Setting Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.