Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Bradlee H. Thornton, against $3,990.00 U.S. Currency, Joyce, Jessica, Wulfjen, Ryan, represented by John C Hafley, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Michalk, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Seizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Non-Jury
Date: February 26, 2018Motion
Date: June 29, 2017Finance - Bill of Cost
Date: May 08, 2017Minute of the Court
Date: May 04, 2017Proposed Order
Date: April 11, 2017Motion for Default Judgment
Date: April 11, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: April 11, 2017Minute of the Court
Date: March 21, 2017Notice
Date: March 10, 2017Request For Service
Date: December 28, 2016Answer
Date: January 26, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: December 28, 2016E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Discovery Control Plan, Trial Preparation Order, and Cover Letter Non-Jury CANCELED Non-Jury (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed02/26/2018Reset by Court to 02/26/2018 |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED Non-Jury (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed02/26/2018Reset by Court to 02/26/2018
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Call/Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Docket Call/Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed02/16/2018Reset by Court to 02/16/2018 Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Motion CANCELED Motion (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing CANCELED Motion (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Finance - Bill of Cost
Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court - Agreed Final Judgment as to Ryan Wulfjen Minute of the Court Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Default Judgment of Forfeiture as to Ryan Wulfjen Proposed Order Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Ryan Wulfjen Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Oral Hearing Notice of Hearing Judge: Michalk, Lisa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.