Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bernard, Louis Maurice, Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bernard, Sandy Leanne, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Scharlene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Scheduling Order
Date: February 21, 2017Original Answer
Date: January 25, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Bench Trial CANCELED Pro Se Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Agreed Resolution Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Scharlene )
Judge: : Valdez, Scharlene |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Pre-Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
DCO PRO SE Scheduling Order Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Respondent Sandy Leanne Bernard's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.