Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Parker, Laura, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Parker, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Minute of the Court
Date: February 27, 2017Request For Service
Date: February 14, 2017Signed Order
Date: February 14, 2017Signed Order
Date: January 25, 2017Request For Service
Date: January 11, 2017Request For Service
Date: December 28, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Request For Service
Date: January 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court: Order of Dismissal Minute of the Court Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Protective Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Robin, Jennifer J. )
Judge: : Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective OrderParker, Kevin Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form Request For Service Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
3rd Extended Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Signed Order Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Protective Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective OrderParker, Kevin Unserved
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
2nd Extended Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Signed Order Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.