Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Richnow, Tracy Wayne, Jr., Way, Allison Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Durst, J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Agreed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship
Date: February 07, 2022Return of Service
Date: January 05, 2022Request For Service
Date: December 01, 2021Proposed Order
Date: December 01, 2021Return of Service
Date: January 24, 2022(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Enforcement
Date: December 01, 2021Minute of the Court
Date: September 26, 2017Letters
Date: September 22, 2017Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: September 22, 2017Answer
Date: September 22, 2017(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Enforcement
Date: September 22, 2017Answer
Date: December 27, 2016Minute of the Court
Date: January 03, 2017Letters
Date: December 27, 2016Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: December 27, 2016(TItle IV-D OAG Use Only) Establishment
Date: December 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship, in Suit for Modification and Order Con Agreed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.) | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation on Tracy Wayne Richnow, Jr. Return of Service |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Unexecuted Citation on Tracy Wayne Richnow, Jr. Return of Service |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationWAY, ALLISON LYNNServed12/22/2021Returned01/05/2022 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationRICHNOW, TRACY WAYNE, Jr.Served01/12/2022Returned01/24/2022 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form on Tracy Wayne Richnow Jr. Request For Service |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Setting Hearing on February 3, 2022 at 9:00 AM Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.