Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martinez, Francisco, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Martha Elena, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Stewart, Keith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Minute of the Court
Date: April 25, 2018Letters
Date: January 29, 2018Letters
Date: October 26, 2017Notice
Date: January 29, 2018Request For Service
Date: September 13, 2016Notice
Date: October 26, 2017Amended Petition
Date: September 13, 2016E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: August 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) 01/17/2018Reset by Court to 04/25/2018
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Letter-Atty/Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Minute of the Court Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Confirmation Fax Letters Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Notice Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Fax Confirmation Letters Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Notice Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form Request For Service Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
First Amended Petition for Divorce Amended Petition Judge: Stewart, Keith |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Stewart, Keith |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.