Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Richardson, Jolene, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by William E. Harrison, against Wells Fargo, represented by James H Pearson, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Mayes, K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2014 |
CategoryOther Civil Case <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: June 02, 2014E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: April 22, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letters Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Garnishee's Original Answer and Motions Original Answer Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on NonSuit Proposed Order Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationWells FargoServed05/01/2014Returned05/01/2014
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application, Affidavit and Judgment.scanned 4-21-14 E-Filed Original Petition Document Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Mayes, K. Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.