Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Milton, Miles Stuart, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Vetrano, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Order to Appoint
Date: May 11, 2016Signed Order
Date: October 14, 2015Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2015Subpoena
Date: July 27, 2015Letters
Date: July 23, 2015Post Judgment - Motion for Contempt (OCA)
Date: June 19, 2015Answer
Date: April 30, 2015Letters
Date: April 24, 2015Letters
Date: April 22, 2015Original Answer
Date: April 08, 2015Post Judgment - Motion for Contempt (OCA)
Date: March 30, 2015Proposed Order
Date: February 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Appoint Attorney Order to Appoint Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Pay Court Appointed Attorney Signed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order to Pay Court Appointed Attorney Proposed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) 07/23/2015Reset by Court to 08/20/2015
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Filing
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.