Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rhodes, Sandra Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rhodes, Adam, represented by Dean Gehring, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Letters
Date: August 26, 2014Proposed Order
Date: August 25, 2014Letters
Date: August 25, 2014Proposed Order
Date: July 10, 2014Order
Date: July 08, 2014Pre-Dispo Motion for Enforcement
Date: July 08, 2014Settlement Agreements
Date: May 13, 2014Amended Petition
Date: March 04, 2014Order
Date: February 14, 2014Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: January 14, 2014Original Answer
Date: January 14, 2014Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Other-Not Billed
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Wage Withholding
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Regarding Req for Pay History Letters Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed QDRO Proposed Order Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter regarding QDRO Letters Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Per Judge Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.