Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Michael J. Scott, against Burchfield, David W, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Letters
Date: December 31, 2013Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 27, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationBurchfield, David WServed01/09/2014Returned01/17/2014
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letters
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.Awarded Against: David Burchfield |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.