Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Montgomery Creek Ranch Community Association, Inc,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tamara L Simich, against Stone, Danny, Stone, Pam, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract-Other <$100,000 & Non-Monetary Relief |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit without Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationStone, DannyServed01/29/2014Returned02/21/2014Stone, PamServed01/29/2014Returned02/21/2014
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.