Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Usher, Ronnie Dean, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Usher, Melody, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Bench Trial CANCELED Pro Se Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Pre-Trial CANCELED Pro Se Pre-Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Decree of Divorce Proposed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.