Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Hernandez, Eduardo H., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Seiler, Michael T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeiler, Michael T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Sexual Predator |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment By Jury Verdict |
Signed Order
Date: February 23, 2019Biennial Review Order
Date: April 26, 2019Order of Commitment
Date: January 30, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 08, 2018Signed Order
Date: January 30, 2019Biennial Review Order
Date: August 17, 2016Appeal - Opinion
Date: November 05, 2015Appeal - Correspondence
Date: November 17, 2014Appeal - Correspondence
Date: September 25, 2014Appeal - Mandate
Date: January 21, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: October 20, 2014Appeal - Notice of Appeal
Date: July 03, 2014Appeal - Correspondence
Date: February 10, 2015Appeal - Correspondence
Date: November 24, 2014Appeal - Notice of Appeal
Date: July 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
BIENNIAL REVIEW CONCLUDED Biennial Review Order Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order to Seal Due Process Hearing Exhibits 2 and 3 Signed Order Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Order of Civil Commitment Order of Commitment Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Placement in Tiered Treatment Program Signed Order Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Maginnis, Patty)
Judge: Maginnis, Patty |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Seiler, Michael T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.